+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 04-02-14 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor