+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Jordan voting no (3) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Say, Fale.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-14-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor