+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to HWN, JDL.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1400) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 405).
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 04-08-15 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333), recommending referral to HLT.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 325.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, HLT, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor