+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306), recommending adoption.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, referral sheet 40
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor