+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward.
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (19)
DECOITE
Type:
Primary Sponsor