+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:15PM in House conference room 308.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor