+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, McKelvey excused (2).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1274), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor