+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 747).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3485) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Tokuda, Slom.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-17-14 10:55AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3461), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, Taniguchi, L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 04-15-14 11:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 8:30AM in conference room 224.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 434).
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor