+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/PSM.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 618).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2002), recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor