+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from TRN/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1815), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Ilagan, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Matsumoto.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/LMG on Tuesday, 03-28-23 11:15AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 20
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor