+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1751) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-22-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to CAI, referral sheet 20
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor