+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 929).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-19.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2183) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HWN.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/JDC.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527).
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1947), recommending adoption.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor