+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Ing, Kong, Tupola.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor