+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in conference room 329.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor