+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Kobayashi, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241-14), recommending referral to WAL.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor