+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN/GVO.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1531) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 25
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor