+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 727) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 9:45AM in conference room 224.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 388).
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315), recommending adoption.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Coffman; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-25-13 8:45AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 37
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor