+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 818).
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3808) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-18 1:15PM in conference room 225.
- Re-Referred to TRE.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 435).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779-18), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1621-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-21-18 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor