+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Perruso, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Har, Holt, Ilagan, Kapela, Kong, LoPresti, Marten, Okimoto, Quinlan, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward, Wildberger voting no (16) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Nakamura.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt voting no (1) and none excused (0).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275), recommending referral to JHA.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-23-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 25
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor