+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1571-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-23-16 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor