+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-14), recommending referral to LAB.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Takayama, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-20-14 11:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, LAB, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor