+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:40AM in conference room 423.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor