+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 441).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-16 10:15AM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.