+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2050), recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1761), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:05PM in conference room 312.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor