+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360), recommending referral to HED.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, HED, referral sheet 37
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor