+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 696).
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3696) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3614), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Slom.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-16 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 440).
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1511-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:15PM in House conference room 308.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.