+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Woodson.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-24-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor