+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465-14), recommending adoption.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Takayama, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-20-14 11:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor