+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/PSM.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040), recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1833), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor