+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Fale, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Hanohano, Har, Ito, Say, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Lowen, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085-14), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Say, Fale.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor