+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 676) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1695) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Galuteria.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-23-15 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Espero.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA, WAM.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426), recommending adoption.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor