+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 956).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1948) with recommendation of adoption.
- One Day Notice 04-24-23.
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa.
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On March 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to TCA.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496).
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1747), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-22-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to CAI, referral sheet 20
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Offered
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor