+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-16.
- Reported from EET/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3686) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Galuteria, L. Thielen.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 04-18-16 2:15PM in conference room 414.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/WLA.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 428).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 04-04-16 11:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380-16), recommending referral to WAL.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-16 8:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, WAL, referral sheet 25
- Offered
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor