+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 921).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
- Reported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2225) with recommendation of adoption.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Riviere.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/WAM.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 594).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2011), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger, Thielen; and Excused: none.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 20
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor