+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TIA, JDL.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 409).
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Fale, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Hashem excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1367-14), recommending adoption.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270-14), recommending referral to JUD.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 24
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Offered
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor