+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3663), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-16 2:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 424).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576-16), recommending adoption.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194-16), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Morikawa.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-17-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21
- Offered
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor