+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Fukumoto.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:35AM in conference room 312.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 20
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor