+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 15
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor