+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 31
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor