+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380).
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakashima, Onishi, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Todd excused (7).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1547) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-22-17 3:00PM in conference room 309.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, referral sheet 16
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor