+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/EGH/WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 656).
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1640), recommending adoption.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1, with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused.
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 02-11-13 10:05AM in conference room 329.
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 20
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor