+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Oshiro, Saiki, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-13-15 11:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-15 at 11:30am.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 329.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 13
- Offered
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor