+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 607).
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
- Resolution adopted in final form.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 795) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-16-21.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HTH.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 338).
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588), recommending adoption.
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ohno excused (2).
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324), recommending referral to CPC.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Friday, 03-19-21 10:30AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 15
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Offered
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor