+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House.
- Adopted.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-18-13.
- Waived referral to WTL/WAM.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/WAM.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 654).
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1679), recommending adoption.
- Adopted with Representative(s) Awana, Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
- Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting no (2) and none excused (0).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-11-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 12
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Offered
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- To be offered.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor