+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 884).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution adopted in final form.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 944) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-22-19.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2187) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 10:10AM in conference room 414.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2062), recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor