+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong.
On March 18, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-17 8:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered