+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
- Reported from LHE/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Quinlan, Tokioka.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/LAB on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor