+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 440).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Senate.
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1802-18), recommending adoption.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor