+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Tupola.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor