+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 414.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/PSM, WAM.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431).
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and none excused (0).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593), recommending adoption.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Offered
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor